LA SB365 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-9)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that information be provided to students about high-demand, high-wage jobs during the development and revision of their individual graduation plans. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that information be provided to students about high-demand, high-wage jobs during the development and revision of their individual graduation plans. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365 CONCUR (#641) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 365 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365 CO-AUTHORS (#243) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365 FINAL PASSAGE (#242) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 238.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-27HouseRules suspended.
2020-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-27HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-18SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2020-05-14SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB365&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164182
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172431
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173762
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178454
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182292
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172724
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173440
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172820
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176387
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175874
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176761
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177606
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164183
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172521
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173931
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176385
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173734
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173735
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177409
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178336

Bill Comments

feedback