LA SB34 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the payment of certain insurance premium costs for certain retired assessors and assessors' employees in Catahoula Parish. (8/15/11) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Provides for the payment of certain insurance premium costs for certain retired assessors and assessors' employees in Catahoula Parish. (8/15/11) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - House - House Vote on SB 34, FINAL PASSAGE (#534) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 34, FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 34, FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Effective date 8/15/11. | |
2011-06-20 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 45. | |
2011-06-15 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-14 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-13 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-18 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-16 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-05-10 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-04-07 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |