LA SB335 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 52 yeas, 35 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 52 yeas, 35 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a juvenile in a correctional facility to serve additional time when he commits an assault or battery on an employee of the facility or another juvenile in the facility or a simple or aggravated escape. (See Act) (RE1 DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for a juvenile in a correctional facility to serve additional time when he commits an assault or battery on an employee of the facility or another juvenile in the facility or a simple or aggravated escape. (See Act) (RE1 DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 335 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1712) (Y: 52 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 2/3 vote (#1385) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 CO-AUTHORS (#361) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 2/3 vote (#1385) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 CO-AUTHORS (#361) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | By a vote of 52 yeas, 35 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice given. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |