LA SB321 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Charter School Facilities Fund within the Louisiana Department of Education. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Charter School Facilities Fund within the Louisiana Department of Education. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |