LA SB32 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Grants certain operational autonomies to certain public postsecondary education institutions. (gov sig) (Item #42) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Grants certain operational autonomies to certain public postsecondary education institutions. (gov sig) (Item #42) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 32 CONCUR (#132) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Vote on SB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 32 CO-AUTHORS (#32) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Vote on SB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 32 CO-AUTHORS (#32) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 32 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Senate | Effective date 10/28/2020. |
2020-10-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 36. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |