LA SB31 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits use of statewide student assessments conducted during the 2020-2021 school year for the purposes of evaluating teacher performance or student placement decisions. (gov sig) (Item #42)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits use of statewide student assessments conducted during the 2020-2021 school year for the purposes of evaluating teacher performance or student placement decisions. (gov sig) (Item #42)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#157) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#58) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-10-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-20SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-19SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-10-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-15HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-10-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-10-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20.
2020-10-14HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-14HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-10-14HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-10-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-09-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=SB31&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189378
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191441
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191965
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193168
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190682
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191311
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191607
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189379
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191563
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191912
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192859

Bill Comments

feedback