LA SB30 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides regarding purchase of telecommunications and video equipment by certain educational entities. (1/1/21) (Item #42) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Provides regarding purchase of telecommunications and video equipment by certain educational entities. (1/1/21) (Item #42) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 CONCUR (#119) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#131) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#131) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 52. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/16/2020. |
2020-10-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020. |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |