LA SB3 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for administration of incentive rebates under the Quality Jobs and Enterprise Zone programs. (Items #21 and 27)(gov sig) (REF -$3,128,880 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for administration of incentive rebates under the Quality Jobs and Enterprise Zone programs. (Items #21 and 27)(gov sig) (REF -$3,128,880 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 CONCUR (#82) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#56) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateEffective date 6/12/2018.
2018-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 11.
2018-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-06-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-06-04SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-06-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/18.
2018-06-01HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-06-01HouseRules suspended.
2018-06-01HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-06-01HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-31HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-05-30SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-24SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=182ES&b=SB3&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100179
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100759
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102197
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103278
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104228
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100913
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100633
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101395
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102729
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103153
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100180
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100384
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100820
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101339
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102300
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102528
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103750
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102172
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103139
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103255

Bill Comments

feedback