LA SB283 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 24 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 24 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the crime of crime against nature by solicitation. (8/1/24)
Title
Repeals the crime of crime against nature by solicitation. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#415) (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 24 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 25 nays. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |