LA SB27 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates and provides for the Streamlining Government Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates and provides for the Streamlining Government Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 CONCUR (#171) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#162) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#90) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-30SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-06-30SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-06-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/29/20.
2020-06-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-25HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-06-25HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-06-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-22SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-06-14SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=SB27&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182027
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183080
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185068
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183074
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183034
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184027
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184037
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184293
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184591
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184804
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182028
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182931
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183320
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184142
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185389
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183628
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185033

Bill Comments

feedback