LA SB27 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits expungement of domestic abuse battery convictions. (gov sig)
Title
Prohibits expungement of domestic abuse battery convictions. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 CONCUR (#652) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#690) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#267) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#690) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#267) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2015. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 151. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-05-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |