LA SB256 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the alternative fuel tax credit for certain flexible fuel vehicles. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Prohibits the alternative fuel tax credit for certain flexible fuel vehicles. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#708) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#344) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#344) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2013. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 219. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-05-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |