LA SB250 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the Germantown Colony Museum from the jurisdiction of the Department of State. (2/1/17) (EG -$13,345 GF EX See Note)
Title
Removes the Germantown Colony Museum from the jurisdiction of the Department of State. (2/1/17) (EG -$13,345 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |