LA SB250 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a pilot program (Statewide Motor Vehicle Theft and Uninsured Motorists Identification Program) involving the use of license plate recognition devices for certain purposes. (8/1/15)
Title
Creates a pilot program (Statewide Motor Vehicle Theft and Uninsured Motorists Identification Program) involving the use of license plate recognition devices for certain purposes. (8/1/15)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 ADOPT (#1112) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on SB 250 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1088) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 ADOPT (#1077) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 REJECT (#1024) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#866) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 250 AMENDMENT # 4545 BY ST. GERMAIN MOTION TO ADOPT (#865) (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on SB 250 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1088) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 ADOPT (#1077) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 REJECT (#1024) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#866) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 250 AMENDMENT # 4545 BY ST. GERMAIN MOTION TO ADOPT (#865) (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of original Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2015-06-11 | House | Senate reconsidered the report of the Conference Committee and recommitted the bill to the Conference Commitee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 83, nays 14. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays. |
2015-06-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-10 | House | House conferees appointed: St. Germain, Tim Burns, and Arnold. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Morrish, and Ward. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 13. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-08 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2015-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-06-02 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-05-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |