LA SB249 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governing authority to implement a permitting process for individuals and businesses who open a home which serves six or more individuals. (gov sig)
Title
Requires local governing authority to implement a permitting process for individuals and businesses who open a home which serves six or more individuals. (gov sig)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |