LA SB241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for alternatives in lieu of payment under protest for certain ad valorem taxes. (8/1/22) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for alternatives in lieu of payment under protest for certain ad valorem taxes. (8/1/22) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 ADOPT (#1472) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 241 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1717) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 REJECT (#1169) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#1326) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 241 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1717) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 REJECT (#1169) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#1326) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2022-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Cortez, and Reese. |
2022-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Bishop, Beaullieu, and Schexnayder. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |