LA SB23 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 6/30/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides certain enhanced survivor benefits and insurance coverage for the spouses and children of members killed in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides certain enhanced survivor benefits and insurance coverage for the spouses and children of members killed in the line of duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 23 FINAL PASSAGE (#743) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 23 CO-AUTHORS (#83) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 23 FINAL PASSAGE (#82) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04SenateEffective date 6/30/2021.
2021-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 56.
2021-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
2021-05-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-26SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2021-05-26HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-04-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-21SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-20SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB23&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201224
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214934
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216160
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228642
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232061
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215236
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201225
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210792
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214963
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215675
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216273
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216304
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229038
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235171
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228604

Bill Comments

feedback