LA SB226 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 268.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 268.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consolidates the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners into the Louisiana Behavioral Sciences Regulatory Board. (See Act)
Title
Consolidates the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners into the Louisiana Behavioral Sciences Regulatory Board. (See Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 268. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported by substitute. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=SB226 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=742347 |