LA SB225 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 67 yeas, 24 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 67 yeas, 24 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment to provide for remote operations of the legislature during a declared emergency. (2/3 - CA13s1(A))
Title
Constitutional Amendment to provide for remote operations of the legislature during a declared emergency. (2/3 - CA13s1(A))
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 225 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1711) (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 2/3 vote (#1383) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 2/3 vote (#1383) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | By a vote of 67 yeas, 24 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (10-1-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |