LA SB224 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the posting of auditor notices on the website of the auditee. (8/1/14)
Title
Provides relative to the posting of auditor notices on the website of the auditee. (8/1/14)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 CONCUR (#1386) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1180) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#364) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1180) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#364) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2014. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 693. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2014-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014. |
2014-05-08 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-04-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |