LA SB217 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Effective date 8/24/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Effective date 8/24/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the transport of hazardous materials on that portion of La. Hwy. 48 designated as Apple Street in Norco. (8/1/13)
Title
Prohibits the transport of hazardous materials on that portion of La. Hwy. 48 designated as Apple Street in Norco. (8/1/13)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#188) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#188) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 8/24/2013. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 28. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-04-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |