LA SB217 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date 7/1/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date 7/1/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts the Uniform Prudent Management of Institution Funds Act. (7/1/10)
Title
Adopts the Uniform Prudent Management of Institution Funds Act. (7/1/10)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 217, FINAL PASSAGE (#1122) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 217, FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 217, FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Effective date 7/1/10. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 168. | |
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/04. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-02 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-28 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-27 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |