LA SB212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of US 90 Business-Westbank Expressway in the city of Westwego in Jefferson Parish as the "Michael D. Louviere Memorial Highway". (8/1/21)
Title
Designates a portion of US 90 Business-Westbank Expressway in the city of Westwego in Jefferson Parish as the "Michael D. Louviere Memorial Highway". (8/1/21)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#725) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 212 CO-AUTHORS (#159) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 212 CO-AUTHORS (#159) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2021. |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 107. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-04-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |