LA SB203 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes 24th Judicial District Court to assign certain divisions as a reentry division. (8/1/14)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes 24th Judicial District Court to assign certain divisions as a reentry division. (8/1/14)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 203 CONCUR (#1075) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House Vote on SB 203 FINAL PASSAGE (#922) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 203 FINAL PASSAGE (#187) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30SenateEffective date 8/1/2014.
2014-05-30SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 376.
2014-05-21SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2014-05-20HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2014-05-20SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2014-05-19SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2014-05-15SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2014-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2014-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2014.
2014-04-30HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-29HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2014-04-28HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-04-02HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2014-04-01HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2014-03-31SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-03-26SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-03-25SenateReported favorably.
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2014-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=SB203&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=875988
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885201
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905530
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=913079
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=903862
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=904630
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=875991
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=886047
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912175
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=888170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=903909
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905326

Bill Comments

feedback