LA SB199 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of the Jefferson Place/Bocage Crime Prevention and Improvement District. (6/30/11)
Title
Provides for the creation of the Jefferson Place/Bocage Crime Prevention and Improvement District. (6/30/11)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199, CONCUR (#981) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199, 2/3 vote (#938) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on SB 199, FINAL PASSAGE (#899) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on SB 199, AFTER THE 57TH DAY (#873) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199, FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199, 2/3 vote (#938) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on SB 199, FINAL PASSAGE (#899) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on SB 199, AFTER THE 57TH DAY (#873) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199, FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date 6/30/11. | |
2011-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 384. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-21 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/22/2011. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice given. | |
2011-06-21 | By a vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Notice given. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-10 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-09 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |