LA SB198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for administration, disposition, enforcement, and adjudication of state and local taxes and for the Board of Tax Appeals. (gov sig) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for administration, disposition, enforcement, and adjudication of state and local taxes and for the Board of Tax Appeals. (gov sig) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 198 CONCUR (#979) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 198 REJECT (#978) (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#850) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#61) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateEffective date 6/18/2019.
2019-06-18SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 367.
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 24 yeas and 11 nays.
2019-06-05SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-06-04SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-06-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-06-02HouseReported with amendments (22-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-20HouseReported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB198&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122105
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123439
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125064
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143045
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144509
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123218
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123661
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135535
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135351
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135310
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135288
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140940
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141167
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140980
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140958
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141539
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141818
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142256
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122108
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123386
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124236
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125186
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126461
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135881
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141331
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143860
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145051
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124994
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141693
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142976
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142978

Bill Comments

feedback