LA SB192 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Postsecondary Inclusive Education Fund for funding programs for students with intellectual disabilities. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the Postsecondary Inclusive Education Fund for funding programs for students with intellectual disabilities. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 192 CONCUR (#1376) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#1492) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 192 CO-AUTHORS (#342) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#1492) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 192 CO-AUTHORS (#342) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 682. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-23 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |