LA SB191 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date 6/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to coverage of certain physician-administered drugs and related services. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to coverage of certain physician-administered drugs and related services. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 191 CONCUR (#454) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 191 FINAL PASSAGE (#543) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 191 CO-AUTHORS (#117) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 191 FINAL PASSAGE (#116) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateEffective date 6/1/2021.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 50.
2021-05-27SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-25SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-24SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-20SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-19HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-05HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2021-04-27HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-26SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-21SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-20SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB191&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211736
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215543
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227686
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230698
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215020
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215420
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220951
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221341
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221730
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211738
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216240
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217196
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221364
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227109
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226599
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228800
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235609
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217475
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217477
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226442
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227646

Bill Comments

feedback