LA SB184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to video poker. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to video poker. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 184 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1338) (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 ADOPT (#1241) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 CONCUR (#735) (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on SB 184 FINAL PASSAGE (#685) (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 ADOPT (#1241) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 CONCUR (#735) (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on SB 184 FINAL PASSAGE (#685) (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 184 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 491. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 69, nays 21. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2018-05-14 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Bishop, Mack, and Stefanski. |
2018-05-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Gary Smith, and Donahue. |
2018-05-07 | House | House committee amendments rejected. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and failed to be concurred in by a vote of 18 yeas and 12 nays. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (10-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 4 for March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |