LA SB18 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Effective date 6/30/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Effective date 6/30/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for actuarial determinations and application of funds. (6/30/16) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides for actuarial determinations and application of funds. (6/30/16) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. Patrick Cortez [R] | Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Sen. John Milkovich [D] | Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 18 CONCUR (#659) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2016. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 95. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-04-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |