LA SB173 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Healthcare Coverage for Louisiana Families Protection Act. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Healthcare Coverage for Louisiana Families Protection Act. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 173 FINAL PASSAGE (#748) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 173 AMENDMENT # 3475 BY BROWN C. MOTION TO ADOPT (#747) (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 173 AMENDMENT # 3475 BY BROWN C. END CONSIDERATION OF AMENDMENTS (#746) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173 CO-AUTHORS (#252) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173 FINAL PASSAGE (#251) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-22HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-21HouseReported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-02SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-01SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB173&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121517
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129692
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131608
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140036
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129613
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130462
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133568
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138550
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139658
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139538
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139967
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139965
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121519
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126831
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130403
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131113
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131690
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135853
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140854
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131525
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139979

Bill Comments

feedback