LA SB163 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - By a vote of 67 yeas, 27 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th legislative day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional Amendment to increase the composition of the Louisiana Supreme Court from six to eight associate justices. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional Amendment to increase the composition of the Louisiana Supreme Court from six to eight associate justices. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on SB 163 TO CONSIDER AFTER 57TH CALENDAR DAY (#1186) (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 2/3 vote (#1019) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#1071) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 163 AMENDMENT # 3802 BY STEFANSKI MOTION TO ADOPT (#1068) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 163 DIVISION OF THE AMENDMENTS (#1067) (Y: 8 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 163 END CONSIDERATION OF AMENDMENTS (#1066) (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#131) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseBy a vote of 67 yeas, 27 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th legislative day.
2021-06-09SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-09HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2021-06-07HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2021-06-07HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-03HouseNotice given.
2021-06-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
2021-05-26HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-24HouseReported with amendments (10-5-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-19HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-05-18HouseReported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-28HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-20SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-19SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2021-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB163&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210818
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215080
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218119
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215042
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214882
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215242
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217768
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217087
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225012
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225010
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225006
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225005
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224192
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225699
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227236
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227228
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227453
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229811
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229823
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229827
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229857
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231353
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231383
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232954
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233772
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234316
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210821
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214693
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215663
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215839
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218185
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222813
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225703
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227451
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232966
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232976
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232981
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233824
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233977

Bill Comments 750

feedback