LA SB163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exemption from the requirement that state prisons purchase goods from Prison Enterprises, if the goods can be purchased for less in the parish in which the facility is located. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides an exemption from the requirement that state prisons purchase goods from Prison Enterprises, if the goods can be purchased for less in the parish in which the facility is located. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 CONCUR (#764) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#667) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#213) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#667) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#213) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Effective date 6/14/2017. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 248. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 4. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |