LA SB130 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to contracts for Medicaid pharmacy benefit management services. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to contracts for Medicaid pharmacy benefit management services. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 CONCUR (#1046) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#936) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#404) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-25SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 483.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
2018-04-30HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-26HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-16SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-12SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-11SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB130&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068689
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085505
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096794
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102073
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085439
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090339
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089748
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090653
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095336
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095851
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068690
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085900
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090649
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101714
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096427

Bill Comments 750

feedback