LA SB130 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 8/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish to use a portion of the monies allocated from the Parish Transportation Fund to perform additional work within Calcasieu Parish. (8/1/15) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish to use a portion of the monies allocated from the Parish Transportation Fund to perform additional work within Calcasieu Parish. (8/1/15) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#232) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23SenateEffective date 8/1/2015.
2015-06-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 160.
2015-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2015-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2015-06-01HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2015.
2015-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-05-19HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-07HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2015-05-06HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-06SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-05SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-04SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2015-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB130&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=934359
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944518
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954027
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960073
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=934365
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944139
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945193
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945274
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954706
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954915
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945601
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953910

Bill Comments 750

feedback