LA SB129 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a local municipal or parish authority to allow certain pedestrians to stand in a roadway to solicit charitable contributions under certain circumstances. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a local municipal or parish authority to allow certain pedestrians to stand in a roadway to solicit charitable contributions under certain circumstances. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#362) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-16HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-14SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-13SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback