LA SB124 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the sheriff's offices of certain parishes to issue warning citations. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the sheriff's offices of certain parishes to issue warning citations. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#133) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
2018-04-25HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-24HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-23HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-26HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-03-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-21SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-20SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback