LA SB123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the employment or acceptance of volunteer chaplains in public schools. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the employment or acceptance of volunteer chaplains in public schools. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Abraham [R] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Adam Bass [R] | Sen. Stewart Cathey [R] |
Sen. Rick Edmonds [R] | Sen. Michael Fesi [R] | Sen. Cameron Henry [R] | Sen. Valarie Hodges [R] |
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 123 CO-AUTHORS (#84) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 123 FINAL PASSAGE (#83) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 123 FINAL PASSAGE (#83) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |