LA SB122 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to notice and appeal rights for over-age dependent coverage by any health plan offered under the purview of the Office of Group Benefits. (8/1/20) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to notice and appeal rights for over-age dependent coverage by any health plan offered under the purview of the Office of Group Benefits. (8/1/20) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 FINAL PASSAGE (#142) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-18HouseReported favorably (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-11SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB122&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159302
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170896
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171633
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170336
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170636
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171435
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159304
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165043
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171282
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171378
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171687
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171608

Bill Comments

feedback