LA SB119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to health insurance coverage for mammography. (1/1/22)
Title
Provides relative to health insurance coverage for mammography. (1/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 CONCUR (#446) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 CO-AUTHORS (#113) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 CO-AUTHORS (#113) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 45. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2021-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |