LA SB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Notice Senate's motion to override the Governor's veto failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the concealed carrying of firearms. (8/1/21) (EN DECREASE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the concealed carrying of firearms. (8/1/21) (EN DECREASE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 PASS SUBSEQUENT TO VETO (#3) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 CONCUR (#643) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 118 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 CO-AUTHORS (#129) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 FINAL PASSAGE (#128) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 AMENDMENT # 1185 BY PETERSON ADOPT (#127) (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 AMENDMENT # 1166 BY JACKSON ADOPT (#126) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 AMENDMENT # 852 BY MORRIS ADOPT (#125) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 SUSPEND THE RULES (#124) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-20HouseNotice Senate's motion to override the Governor's veto failed to pass.
2021-07-20SenateBy a vote of 23 yeas and 15 nays, the motion to override the Governor's veto failed to be adopted. Motion to reconsider laid on the table.
2021-07-20SenateReconsidered.
2021-07-20SenateRules suspended.
2021-07-20SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2021-06-24SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-24HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-20HouseReferred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20HouseRules suspended.
2021-05-19HouseReported with amendments (6-4). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-28HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-27SenateBy a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays.
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-20SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-03-30SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB118&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208956
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215131
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218121
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230559
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218057
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217949
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217681
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215907
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226061
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226116
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226947
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208962
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215687
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215941
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216089
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218184
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219590
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227902
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226121
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229510
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232044
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236634
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238112
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218002
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218045
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218066
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218071
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218073
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218076
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229394
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230472
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237620

Bill Comments

feedback