LA SB114 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-08 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for police service classification and discretionary standards of the deputy chief of police position in the city of St. Martinville. (8/1/15)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for police service classification and discretionary standards of the deputy chief of police position in the city of St. Martinville. (8/1/15)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#229) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2015-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
2015-06-03HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-06-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-06-01HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-07HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2015-05-06HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-06SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-05SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-04SenateReported favorably.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2015-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback