LA SB11 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the incorporation of the Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System into the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (7/1/17) (EG SEE BELOW)
Title
Provides for the incorporation of the Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System into the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (7/1/17) (EG SEE BELOW)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 11 RECOMMIT (#274) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 11 RECOMMIT (#274) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 17 nays. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |