LA SB107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the benefit deadline in the Workers' Compensation Second Injury Fund. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Eliminates the benefit deadline in the Workers' Compensation Second Injury Fund. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/29/2015. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 254. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-06-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2015-05-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |