LA SB106 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the duration of a disposition on a felony-grade adjudication. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the duration of a disposition on a felony-grade adjudication. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#1024) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 355.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18.
2018-05-03HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-02HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-01HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-19HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-04-18HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-18SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-18SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-04-03SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2018-03-21SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-20SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback