LA SB10 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-15-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date 6/16/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for mandatory kindergarten attendance and requires compulsory school attendance beginning at age five. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for mandatory kindergarten attendance and requires compulsory school attendance beginning at age five. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on SB 10 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1198) (Y: 70 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 ADOPT (#1041) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 REJECT (#971) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#966) (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 10 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#963) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 10 AMENDMENT # 3832 BY PRESSLY MOTION TO ADOPT (#962) (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 10 AMENDMENT # 3773 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#961) (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 10 AMENDMENT # 3657 BY AMEDEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#960) (Y: 30 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 CO-AUTHORS (#349) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateEffective date 6/16/2021.
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 386.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 70, nays 34. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-09HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-09SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-09SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hughes, Wright, and Pressly.
2021-06-08HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-08SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Abraham, and Robert Mills.
2021-06-08HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-06SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 36. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
2021-05-26HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-24HouseReported favorably (19-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-19HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-18HouseReported without action, (9-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-17HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-11SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-26SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-04-21SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-02-22SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB10&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200354
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216064
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224184
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234256
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235875
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215960
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212651
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216286
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222496
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225549
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231535
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231228
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229450
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200355
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212635
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217536
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224349
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224803
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231569
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232208
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233948
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234566
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235901
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224067
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224068
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231551
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231554
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231705
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231713
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234000
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234172

Bill Comments

feedback