LA SB1 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the redistricting of the Louisiana Senate. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the redistricting of the Louisiana Senate. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote on SB 1, FINAL PASSAGE (#94) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 50 BY JONES, R. (#93) (Y: 18 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 49 BY JONES, R. (#92) (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 179 BY JACKSON, ADOPT (#47) (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 180 BY JACKSON, ADOPT (#46) (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 178 BY JACKSON, ADOPT (#45) (Y: 9 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 50 BY JONES, R. (#93) (Y: 18 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 49 BY JONES, R. (#92) (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 179 BY JACKSON, ADOPT (#47) (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 180 BY JACKSON, ADOPT (#46) (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1, AMENDMENT # 178 BY JACKSON, ADOPT (#45) (Y: 9 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 24. | |
2011-04-13 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-04-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2011. | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2011. | |
2011-04-06 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-04-06 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably (11-6) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-03-30 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-03-29 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-03-29 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-03-24 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 03/29. | |
2011-03-24 | Rules suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-03-20 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |