LA HR50 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Acadian Air Med 6 crew members on a successful rescue and patient transport mission
Title
Commends the Acadian Air Med 6 crew members on a successful rescue and patient transport mission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |
2020-06-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |