LA HR45 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 23, 2022, as Lacombe Earth Day and Louisiana Bicycle Festival Day
Title
Recognizes April 23, 2022, as Lacombe Earth Day and Louisiana Bicycle Festival Day
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |