LA HR44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the governor to ensure that individual liberty and rights are protected as the state administers contact tracing
Title
Directs the governor to ensure that individual liberty and rights are protected as the state administers contact tracing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 44 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#750) (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 2. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |